U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00227
  • Case Name: Hutchins v. Social Security Administration Acting Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 15, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Remanding Case to US Agency]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 02, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply Brief]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Remand]
  • February 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 06, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • January 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 05, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2019: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.