U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Evans v. Claims Management Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 24, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 12, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Brief]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Staying Case]
  • March 03, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 19, 2019: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.