U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Western Falcon LLC v. Kukal
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 05, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript - SEALED]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 10, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 24, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 23, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • April 15, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 05, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Counterclaim]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 30, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.