U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Roden et al v. Redline Trucking Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 02, 2020: [Witness List]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • January 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • January 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • December 03, 2019: [Recusal]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.