U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Craig Cunningham v. Technologic USA, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Default Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • April 24, 2020: [Entry of Default]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • February 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Default Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.