U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00258
  • Case Name: United States of America v. HK-SP89 short barreled rifle
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Default Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 17, 2020: [Entry of Default]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Service by Publication]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Return of Warrant of Arrest In Rem - Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Application]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.