U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Easters v. MVS Express LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 07, 2020: [Witness List]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 01, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 18, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • January 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • December 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.