U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20801
  • Case Name: James Harold Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2021
  • September 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Pymts]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2020
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Filing of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.