U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Trigg v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 26, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.