U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00265
  • Case Name: LafargeHolcim Ltd v Carbon GeoCycle Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.