U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Stigaard v. Shabani et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 28, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 01, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 12, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 12, 2021: [Proposed Verdict]
  • April 12, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2021: [Opposition]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 03, 2021: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Mediation]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 11, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 11, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.