U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Daugherty v. Rock Springs WY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 28, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.