U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00266
  • Case Name: McKinney v. Granite Peak Fabrication LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 07, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 04, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 04, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 27, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 16, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 03, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 02, 2021: [In Limine]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 06, 2021: [Brief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 23, 2021: [Brief]
  • July 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2021: [Opposition]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 24, 2021: [Quash]
  • June 24, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Strike]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • May 12, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 19, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • February 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2020: [Opposition]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.