U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Justice Oil & Gas LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 14, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 01, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.