U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00268
  • Case Name: National Grange of the Order of Patrons of Husbandry v. Grange Conservation LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 16, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.