U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Parkhurst v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.