U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: JMK 3 LLC v. The Geneus Group LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 13, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [In Court Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Compel]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Default Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Default Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • February 11, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 10, 2020: [Entry of Default]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.