U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Murray et al v. American Colloid Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 02, 2022: [Designation]
  • May 02, 2022: [Objection]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • April 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 07, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Strike]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 28, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • January 07, 2022: [Disqualify]
  • January 07, 2022: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • July 29, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 26, 2020: [Add Party]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 20, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • April 20, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 19, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • February 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 18, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 06, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • February 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.