U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Jessie WDR et al v. Hospitality Partners of Wyoming Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 06, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Mediation]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 03, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 20, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Praecipe]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.