U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Moser v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 20, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 06, 2020: [Show Cause]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.