U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Doussett v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 07, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.