U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Campos et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • January 25, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 18, 2020: [Designation]
  • December 18, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 02, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • February 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.