U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Ashby et al v. Aubuchon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • November 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • September 10, 2020: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Intervene]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 08, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.