U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Cooper v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Honor Conservation Camp Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 10, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 10, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.