U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Geissler et al v. Riviera Operating LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • March 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 09, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • February 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • February 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.