U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Strauss et al v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.