U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Quallen v. Albany County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 12, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • February 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.