U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Pfingston v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.