U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Schlesner et al v. Monahan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 14, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 13, 2020: [Removal]
  • February 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.