U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Weidenbach v Casper Natrona County Health Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 08, 2021: [Mediation]
  • July 01, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Response]
  • May 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 17, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • May 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 16, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Witness List]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.