open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming

WYOMING PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:20-20052
    Party Name:Chasnee Ann Schaefer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Appointment Rejection]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Appointment Rejection]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Take Notice]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wyb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49819
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =