U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Pike et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 14, 2020: [Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.