U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Bird v. Easton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • November 10, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 09, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • September 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2020: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.