U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Popovski et al v. Titan Transfer Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Designation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2022: [Statement]
  • March 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response]
  • March 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • February 11, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 10, 2022: [Response]
  • February 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [In Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Mediation]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 24, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Witness List]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • July 20, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • July 08, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 08, 2021: [Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Vacate]
  • April 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Strike]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 19, 2021: [Witness List]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 07, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • May 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 23, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.