U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20063
  • Case Name: Goretti (nmn) Catano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
April, 2020
  • April 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • March 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.