U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Johnson v. SSC Sheridan Operating Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2020: [Opposition]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 05, 2020: [Entry of Default]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 31, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • February 21, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • February 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.