U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Aspen American Insurance Company v. Wolverine Resources LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Vacating Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2022: [Response]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • March 21, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 18, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • March 02, 2022: [Writ Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Application for Writ]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [Default Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Default Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Status Report Order]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 01, 2020: [Entry of Default]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.