U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Merit Energy Company LLC et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 23, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 23, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 23, 2021: [Payment Entry]
  • July 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 22, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2021: [Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 21, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Brief]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 05, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • March 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 24, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • February 24, 2020: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.