U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Magnan v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Letter(s)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 27, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.