U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Johns v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter(s)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Letter(s)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 16, 2020: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • April 21, 2020: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • April 21, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 14, 2020: [Financial Entry]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 02, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 02, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.