U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Harvey et al v. Killpack Trucking Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • March 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.