U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Hendry
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Mediation]
  • February 16, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Witness List]
  • January 28, 2021: [Witness List]
  • January 15, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 20, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • March 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.