U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20085
  • Case Name: Wyoming Investment Partners, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
June, 2020
  • June 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacate]
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacate]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion ]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacate]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting Explanation]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A B-J]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice ]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Disk]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corp/Ptnr Resolution]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.