U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Gardner v. Riverton WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 25, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [USCA Notification]
  • April 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • April 14, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 02, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2021: [Opposition]
  • February 15, 2021: [Brief]
  • February 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 11, 2021: [Vacate]
  • February 03, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 03, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Witness List]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 28, 2020: [Vacate]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • April 02, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 16, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • March 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 05, 2020: [Removal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Complaint]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.