U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Bird v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2020: [Objection]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 08, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.