U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Shepard et al v. Reed Construction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Requiring Service and Response]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 30, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 11, 2020: [Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.