U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Bruce v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 10, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • July 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 25, 2021: [Response]
  • April 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 07, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 05, 2021: [Witness List]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • June 15, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • June 15, 2020: [(TRMD)Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 22, 2020: [Entry of Default]
  • May 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • April 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • April 17, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.