U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Eck v. Wainwright
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 04, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 11, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 10, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 27, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 25, 2021: [Response]
  • March 23, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 26, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.