U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Bird v Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 17, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 26, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 23, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.