U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Pinnacle Bank - Wyoming v. Hecker
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 04, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • May 05, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 04, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • March 19, 2020: [Removal]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.